+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Municipalities
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Municipalities