+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: AC To AP
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (46)
- 051-0011-0001 -
- 051-0011-0003 -
- 051-0011-0005 -
- 051-0011-0007 -
- 051-0011-0009 -
- 051-0011-0011 -
- 051-0011-0013 -
- 051-0011-0015 -
- 051-0011-0017 -
- 051-0011-0019 -
- 051-0011-0021 -
- 051-0011-0023 -
- 051-0011-0025 -
- 051-0011-0027 -
- 051-0011-0029 -
- 051-0011-0031 -
- 051-0011-0033 -
- 051-0011-0035 -
- 051-0011-0037 -
- 051-0011-0039 -
- 051-0011-0041 -
- 051-0011-0043 -
- 051-0011-0045 -
- 051-0011-0047 -
- 051-0011-0049 -
- 051-0011-0051 -
- 051-0011-0052 -
- 051-0011-0053 -
- 051-0011-0055 -
- 051-0011-0057 -
- 051-0011-0059 -
- 051-0011-0061 -
- 051-0011-0063 -
- 051-0011-0065 -
- 051-0011-0067 -
- 051-0011-0069 -
- 051-0011-0071 -
- 051-0011-0073 -
- 051-0011-0075 -
- 051-0011-0077 -
- 051-0011-0079 -
- 051-0011-0081 -
- 051-0011-0083 -
- 051-0011-0085 -
- 051-0011-0087 -
- 025-0001-0077 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2018: Passed (Senate)
January 25, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor