+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2022: Passed (Senate)
February 2, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor