+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On March 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Rpt Ruled Improper
- Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair
- Point of Order Raised
- Motion to Recommit Lost
On March 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Bryan
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees Named Mims,Barker,Hood
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 31, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 4, 2015: Passed As Amended (Senate)
January 28, 2015: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor