+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Tollison,Caughman,Hill
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bennett,Barton,Cockerham
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2019: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 28, 2019: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 13, 2019: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 6, 2019: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor