+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 8, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Cockerham,Blackmon,Tullos
On June 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Doty,McCaughn,England
On June 27, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Cockerham,Felsher,Hood
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Tabled Subject To Call
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2020: Conference Report Adopted (House)
June 30, 2020: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
June 15, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
March 12, 2020: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor