+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate Release
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
- Reconsidered
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Steverson,Zuber,Powell
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Harkins,Chassaniol,Carter
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Lamar,Zuber,Powell
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 31, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 9, 2021: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 3, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor