+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Brown
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Lamar
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2014: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 7, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor