+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Kirby,Bryan,Parks
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees Named Howell,White,Boyd
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Passed As Amended
- Reconsidered
- Amended
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Medicaid
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 31, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 4, 2015: Passed (Senate)
March 4, 2015: Passed As Amended (Senate)
January 26, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor