+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hines, Lamar, Steverson)
- Passed
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2021: Passed (Senate)
February 3, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor