+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2016: Passed (Senate)
February 11, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor