+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPAA: JB To FI
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B;Finance
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B