+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services