+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Died In Committee
- Recommitted to Committee
- Reconsidered
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hughes, Moore, Roberson)
- Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 1, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor