+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Vote
February 19, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor