+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
+ − Statutes Amended (71)
- 037-0004-0005 -
- 023-0015-0211 -
- 025-0003-0039 -
- 025-0009-0107 -
- 025-0015-0303 -
- 029-0001-0205 -
- 029-0017-0003 -
- 037-0003-0002 -
- 037-0004-0003 -
- 037-0004-0004 -
- 037-0004-0007 -
- 037-0004-0009 -
- 037-0004-0011 -
- 037-0004-0013 -
- 037-0004-0015 -
- 037-0013-0092 -
- 037-0015-0038 -
- 037-0016-0017 -
- 037-0029-0067 -
- 037-0029-0069 -
- 037-0029-0107 -
- 037-0029-0169 -
- 037-0029-0268 -
- 037-0029-0411 -
- 037-0029-0413 -
- 037-0029-0459 -
- 037-0029-0507 -
- 037-0029-0559 -
- 037-0029-0601 -
- 037-0029-0603 -
- 037-0029-0611 -
- 037-0031-0205 -
- 037-0035-0001 -
- 037-0035-0005 -
- 037-0035-0007 -
- 037-0035-0009 -
- 037-0035-0011 -
- 037-0035-0013 -
- 037-0061-0033 -
- 037-0063-0003 -
- 037-0101-0003 -
- 037-0101-0241 -
- 037-0101-0331 -
- 037-0102-0003 -
- 037-0106-0009 -
- 037-0149-0001 -
- 037-0151-0075 -
- 037-0153-0007 -
- 037-0153-0013 -
- 037-0154-0001 -
- 037-0155-0009 -
- 037-0155-0117 -
- 037-0157-0001 -
- 037-0161-0005 -
- 037-0163-0001 -
- 041-0023-0045 -
- 041-0087-0005 -
- 043-0001-0030 -
- 043-0059-0009 -
- 045-0004-0003 -
- 057-0073-0025 -
- 069-0002-0005 -
- 073-0015-0025 -
- 075-0059-0001 -
- 075-0060-0015 -
- 075-0060-0027 -
- 075-0060-0043 -
- 037-0029-0167 -
- 037-0029-0451 -
- 037-0104-0005 -
- 037-0033-0173 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2014: Passed (Senate)
January 23, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor