+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services