+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
- Conference Report Filed
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Currie,Oliver,Lamar
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Chassaniol,Polk,Williams
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Immediate Release
- Passed As Amended
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AP To TO
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: TO To AP
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Tourism;Appropriations
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Tourism