+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
March 5, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor