+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: VM To FI
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs;Finance
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: AP To MA
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: MA To AP
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Military Affairs;Appropriations