+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
- Recommitted to Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Vote
January 21, 2015: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor