+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: IN To AC
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2013: Passed (Senate)
February 14, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor