+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 17, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor