+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Public Health and Welfare
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Vote
February 1, 2017: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor