+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: PH To AP
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services