+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Blount
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Weathersby,Coleman (65th),Mettetal
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: PH To AP
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 7, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Snowden
Type:
Primary Sponsor