+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 6, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor