+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Ports and Marine Resources
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2013: Passed (Senate)
February 6, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor