+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: LP To FI
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private;Finance
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: LP To RU
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: RU To LP
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Rules;Local and Private Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2014: Passed (Senate)
February 12, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor