+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 20, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor