+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Turner, Rushing, Tullos)
- Passed
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: CA To MU
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: MU To CA
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Municipalities;County Affairs
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor