+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: PP To RU
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: RU To PP
- Referred To Rules;Public Property
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
January 23, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor