+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Veterans and Military Affairs
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Military Affairs
+ − Vote
January 29, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor