+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Education