+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Amendment Failed
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Johnson, Roberson, Currie)
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- Referred To Rules
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
January 12, 2022: Passed (Senate)
January 6, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor