+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Vote
February 9, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor