+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
January 31, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor