+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (43rd), Johnson, Massengill, Reynolds)
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
January 23, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor