+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2015: Passed (Senate)
January 20, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor