+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 6, 2016: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
March 24, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 29, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor