+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2018: Passed (Senate)
January 31, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor