+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: AG To FI
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture;Finance
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Agriculture