+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2014: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
March 5, 2014: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 6, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Snowden
Type:
Primary Sponsor