+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPAA: PH To AP
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services