+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Apportionment and Elections