+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Polk,Burton,Clarke
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Barker
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPAA: AC To PH
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Public Health and Welfare
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (64)
- 021-0027-0207 -
- 041-0003-0015 -
- 041-0003-0018 -
- 041-0007-0188 -
- 041-0009-0009 -
- 041-0026-0023 -
- 041-0026-0101 -
- 041-0058-0003 -
- 041-0059-0011 -
- 041-0059-0017 -
- 041-0059-0023 -
- 041-0059-0033 -
- 041-0059-0035 -
- 041-0059-0065 -
- 041-0059-0079 -
- 041-0067-0012 -
- 041-0067-0025 -
- 041-0067-0037 -
- 041-0067-0039 -
- 041-0071-0005 -
- 041-0071-0007 -
- 041-0075-0007 -
- 041-0075-0009 -
- 041-0077-0009 -
- 041-0077-0025 -
- 041-0085-0007 -
- 041-0125-0007 -
- 043-0011-0007 -
- 043-0011-0008 -
- 043-0011-0009 -
- 043-0011-0013 -
- 043-0016-0025 -
- 043-0020-0008 -
- 043-0020-0011 -
- 043-0020-0013 -
- 043-0020-0059 -
- 045-0014-0031 -
- 045-0023-0023 -
- 045-0023-0041 -
- 045-0023-0045 -
- 045-0023-0053 -
- 073-0007-0071 -
- 073-0010-0009 -
- 073-0010-0011 -
- 073-0010-0021 -
- 073-0014-0017 -
- 073-0014-0019 -
- 073-0014-0027 -
- 073-0014-0031 -
- 073-0024-0029 -
- 073-0038-0031 -
- 073-0055-0013 -
- 073-0057-0019 -
- 073-0057-0021 -
- 073-0057-0027 -
- 073-0057-0029 -
- 073-0061-0001 -
- 073-0061-0003 -
- 073-0065-0005 -
- 073-0065-0009 -
- 073-0065-0011 -
- 075-0029-0805 -
- 075-0031-0065 -
- 075-0074-0011 -
+ − Votes (4)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 28, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
March 3, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor