+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services