+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Municipalities
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency