+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2020: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
June 10, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 25, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor