+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Rushing, Hopkins)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: JA To MU
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: MU To JA
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Municipalities;Judiciary A